WA SB5709 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a microbrewery and domestic brewery to sell beer of another domestic brewery for on and off-premises consumption from its premises.
Title
Allowing a microbrewery and domestic brewery to sell beer of another domestic brewery for on and off-premises consumption from its premises.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Curtis King [R] |
Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2011-03-07 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-18 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 9:00 AM. | |
2011-02-08 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5709&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5709.pdf |