WA SB5716 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Defining when federal government employees are unemployed for purposes of unemployment insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Defining when federal government employees are unemployed for purposes of unemployment insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-02-07HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2019-02-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-02-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-05SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-04SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-04SenateLBRC - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-04SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:05 PM.
2019-01-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-29SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback