WA SB5720 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing student financial literacy education.
Title
Providing student financial literacy education.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Chris Gildon [R] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Education (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Education (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Chapter 238, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2022-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee amendment |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2022-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2022-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-24 | House | ED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 300 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28a | 310 | New Code | See Bill Text |