WA SB5798 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending certain insurance notice requirements.
Title
Extending certain insurance notice requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2025. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 244, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2024-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-03-01 | House | Committee amendment |
2024-02-29 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-21 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-21 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | BFGT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade. |
2023-12-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
48 | 18 | 290 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 18 | 2901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 18 | 291 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 18 | 292 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |