WA SB5800 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - On motion, referred to Law & Justice.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - On motion, referred to Law & Justice.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning obligations of mental health professionals.
Title
Concerning obligations of mental health professionals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | On motion, referred to Law & Justice. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-10 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1810 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.