WA SB5828 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain school districts and educational service districts to designate a district treasurer.
Title
Authorizing certain school districts and educational service districts to designate a district treasurer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | Made eligible to be placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Education. | |
2009-03-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-10 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-10 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-05 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-03 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1971 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.