WA SB5828 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing recommendations of the autonomous vehicle work group.
Title
Implementing recommendations of the autonomous vehicle work group.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] |
Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 12:30 PM. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2070 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-20 - First reading, referred to Transportation.