WA SB5831 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning an employer's payment of indebtedness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning an employer's payment of indebtedness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-19SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-04-19SenateChapter 89, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-19SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-16SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-12SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-11HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-11HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-25HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2019-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2019-02-20SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-19SenateLBRC - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-19SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback