WA SB5834 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing enterprise-wide technology policies in state government to ensure consistency, security, and responsible use of data.
Title
Implementing enterprise-wide technology policies in state government to ensure consistency, security, and responsible use of data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing scheduled, but not heard in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 105 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 105 | 369 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |