WA SB5846 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-25 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-25 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Offering health benefit subsidies for certain retired public employees.
Title
Offering health benefit subsidies for certain retired public employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-24 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-05-25 | House refuses to recede and insists on its position. | |
2011-05-25 | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. | |
2011-05-24 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 69; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2011-05-24 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-05-24 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on second reading. | |
2011-05-23 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-05-23 | WAYS - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-05-23 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 5:00 PM. | |
2011-05-21 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-05-20 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2011-05-20 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-05-20 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-04-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-15 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-04-15 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-04-15 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-04-15 | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-04-14 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-04-13 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 2:30 PM. | |
2011-04-01 | Executive action scheduled, but the motion to report the bill out of the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM failed. | |
2011-03-24 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-02-22 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |