WA SB5853 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-13)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Regarding the school construction assistance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding the school construction assistance program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Capital Budget.
2019-03-09SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 5; absent, 1; excused, 3.
2019-03-09SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-09SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-09Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-28SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-28SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-07SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback