WA SB5861 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Extending respectful workplace code of conduct provisions to all members of the legislative community.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending respectful workplace code of conduct provisions to all members of the legislative community.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateEffective date 7/28/2019*.
2019-05-21SenateChapter 469, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-21SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-27SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-26SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 29; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-26SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-15HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0.
2019-04-15HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-15HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-12HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-02HouseSGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-28HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-08HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
2019-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-06Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-21SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-21SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-21SenateSGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 5:30 PM.
2019-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-07SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5861&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5861.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5861-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5861-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5861-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119289&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5861&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119289&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-15-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5861&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119289&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-26-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5861&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback