WA SB5881 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing provisions involving truancy.
Title
Changing provisions involving truancy.
Sponsors
Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Fred Jarrett [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] |
Sen. Debbie Regala [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-28 | Chapter 266, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-28 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-21 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-15 | President signed. | |
2009-04-14 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-04-14 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-13 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-25 | ED - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-25 | ED - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-25 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-13 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-06 | First reading, referred to Education. | |
2009-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 6:00 PM. | |
2009-02-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-05 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |