WA SB5881 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to revenue.
Title
Relating to revenue.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 6:30 PM. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |