WA SB5884 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing behavioral health support specialists.
Title
Establishing behavioral health support specialists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2022-02-11 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | BH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 11:30 AM. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
18 | 130 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |