WA SB5902 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reinvesting account revenue for the purpose of supporting the state park system.
Title
Reinvesting account revenue for the purpose of supporting the state park system.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 84 | 092 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
79a | 05 | 170 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |