WA SB5908 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning property tax refunds.
Title
Concerning property tax refunds.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] | Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | GOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |