WA SB5915 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Effective date 5/19/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Effective date 5/19/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing emergency rule making when the state employment growth forecast is estimated to be less than one percent. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Authorizing emergency rule making when necessary to implement budget appropriations and reductions. )
Title
Authorizing emergency rule making when the state employment growth forecast is estimated to be less than one percent. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Authorizing emergency rule making when necessary to implement budget appropriations and reductions. )
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Effective date 5/19/2009. | |
2009-05-19 | Chapter 559, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-19 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-26 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-26 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-26 | President signed. | |
2009-04-25 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-25 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-25 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-25 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-04-25 | WAYS - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-04-25 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-04-25 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 8:30 AM. | |
2009-04-23 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-04-21 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-04-21 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-21 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-24 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-06 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |