WA SB5922 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-15 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-15 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the department of fish and wildlife's habitat recovery pilot program.
Title
Modifying the department of fish and wildlife's habitat recovery pilot program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2023-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2085 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-17 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.