WA SB5946 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting freedom of student press and speech.
Title
Protecting freedom of student press and speech.
Sponsors
Sen. Darlene Fairley [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. Christopher Marr [D] |
Sen. Joe McDermott [D] | Sen. Edward Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-09 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5946&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5946.pdf |