WA SB5946 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting consumers from the discontinuance of the London interbank offered rate.
Title
Protecting consumers from the discontinuance of the London interbank offered rate.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-23 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | BFST - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | New Code | See Bill Text |