WA SB5953 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning financial aid grants for incarcerated students.
Title
Concerning financial aid grants for incarcerated students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass without amendment(s) by Postsecondary Education & Workforce (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass without amendment(s) by Postsecondary Education & Workforce (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Chapter 272, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 35; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2024-02-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-02-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-29 | House | Committee amendment |
2024-02-27 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-02-21 | House | PEW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-10 | House | First reading, referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | HS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
72 | 09 | 460 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 09 | 465 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |