WA SB5984 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning language understanding of documents used in dissolution proceedings.
Title
Concerning language understanding of documents used in dissolution proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-28 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |