WA SB6031 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating contractor reporting requirements for public works contracts awarded or managed by the department of enterprise services.
Title
Creating contractor reporting requirements for public works contracts awarded or managed by the department of enterprise services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6031&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6031.pdf |