WA SB6065 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting children under the age of eighteen from the harmful effects of exposure to ultraviolet radiation associated with tanning devices.
Title
Protecting children under the age of eighteen from the harmful effects of exposure to ultraviolet radiation associated with tanning devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Michael Hewitt [R] |
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 87, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 42; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2014-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-26 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-26 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |