WA SB6077 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the forfeiture of the pension of a public employee convicted of a felony for misconduct associated with such person's service as a public employee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the forfeiture of the pension of a public employee convicted of a felony for misconduct associated with such person's service as a public employee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2016-01-11SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-06-28SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-05-29SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-04-29SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-03-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2015-03-04SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback