WA SB6096 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for property tax exemption for the value of new construction of industrial/manufacturing facilities in targeted urban areas.
Title
Providing for property tax exemption for the value of new construction of industrial/manufacturing facilities in targeted urban areas.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Pearson [R] | Sen. John McCoy [D] | Rep. Lisa Brown [D] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2014-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-26 | House | TED - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-26 | House | TED - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to Technology & Economic Development. |
2014-02-20 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | TRED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development. |