WA SB6098 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing transparency of campaign contributions.
Title
Increasing transparency of campaign contributions.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Billig [D] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Donald Benton [R] |
Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Karen Fraser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6098&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6098.pdf |