WA SB6101 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning hospital at-home services.
Title
Concerning hospital at-home services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2024-02-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2295 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 126 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70 | 127 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 38 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |