WA SB6146 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Effective date 7/1/2025*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Effective date 7/1/2025*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tribal warrants.
Title
Concerning tribal warrants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2025*. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Chapter 207, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2024-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2024-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee amendment |
2024-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-20 | House | CSJR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 4:00 PM. |
2024-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2305 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-11 - First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | New Code | See Bill Text |