WA SB6149 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing contractor liability for industrial insurance premiums for not-for-profit nonemergency medicaid transportation brokers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing contractor liability for industrial insurance premiums for not-for-profit nonemergency medicaid transportation brokers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-03SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2014-02-06SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2014-02-06SenateMinority; do not pass.
2014-02-06SenateCL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2014-02-05SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
2014-01-31SenateExecutive session in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM.
2014-01-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
2014-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Commerce & Labor.

Same As/Similar To

HB2318 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback