WA SB6162 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Effective date 6/28/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Effective date 6/28/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the expiration date of the invasive species council and account.
Title
Concerning the expiration date of the invasive species council and account.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] |
Sen. Kirk Pearson [R] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Karen Fraser [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage notwithstanding Governor's Veto (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate vote on Passage notwithstanding the Governor's veto (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate vote on Passage notwithstanding the Governor's veto (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Effective date 6/28/2016. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Chapter 7, 2016 Laws 1st Special Session. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2016-03-29 | House | On motion, Governor's veto overridden; yeas, 85; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | On motion, Governor's veto overridden; yeas, 43; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Governor vetoed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-29 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-26 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-26 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | NRP - Majority; do pass. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |
2016-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2331 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.