WA SB6175 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning housing affordability tax incentives for existing structures. Revised for 2nd Substitute: Providing a sales and use tax incentive for existing structures. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Concerning housing affordability tax incentives for existing structures.)
Title
Concerning housing affordability tax incentives for existing structures. Revised for 2nd Substitute: Providing a sales and use tax incentive for existing structures. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Concerning housing affordability tax incentives for existing structures.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass with amendment(s) by Housing (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Housing: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass with amendment(s) by Housing (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Housing: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Chapter 332, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2024-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-03-05 | House | Committee amendment |
2024-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-26 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2024-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-20 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing at 4:00 PM. |
2024-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Housing. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2024-02-09 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | HSG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2308 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
82 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
84 | New Code | See Bill Text |