WA SB6222 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Streamlining and simplifying alcohol permits and licenses.
Title
Streamlining and simplifying alcohol permits and licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6222&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6222.pdf |