WA SB6239 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing compliance with apprenticeship utilization requirements and bidding on public works projects.
Title
Addressing compliance with apprenticeship utilization requirements and bidding on public works projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 255, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 37; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |