WA SB6270 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that health care professional licensees may not be required to participate in any public or private third-party reimbursement program.
Title
Providing that health care professional licensees may not be required to participate in any public or private third-party reimbursement program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2012-02-14 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-01-31 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-01-31 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-01-31 | HEA - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-01-30 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 6:00 PM. | |
2012-01-25 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-01-16 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2621 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6270&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6270.pdf |