WA SB6270 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring the insurance and financial responsibility program.
Title
Transferring the insurance and financial responsibility program.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | FIHI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2448 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-13 - Effective date 6/12/2014.