WA SB6330 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning medical certificate requirements for applicants and holders of commercial drivers' licenses and commercial learners' permits.
Title
Concerning medical certificate requirements for applicants and holders of commercial drivers' licenses and commercial learners' permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2018-02-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2696 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Effective date 4/30/2019.