WA SB6393 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying and updating small works roster construction and limited public works requirements.
Title
Modifying and updating small works roster construction and limited public works requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] |
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2722 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.