WA SB6402 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Defining honey bee products and services as an agricultural product.
Title
Defining honey bee products and services as an agricultural product.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Rep. Lisa Brown [D] | Sen. Brian Dansel [R] |
Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] | Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-04 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | AWRD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, and Water & Rural Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development. |