WA SB6480 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning impact payments of a municipally owned hydroelectric facility.
Title
Concerning impact payments of a municipally owned hydroelectric facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-25 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-15 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2925 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-24 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6480&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6480.pdf |