WA SB6512 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing housing to school district employees.
Title
Providing housing to school district employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |