WA SB6522 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting noncompetition agreements.
Title
Limiting noncompetition agreements.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |