WA SB6550 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a sales and use tax exemption for sales and uses related to eligible server equipment and power infrastructures installed in eligible computer data centers.
Title
Providing a sales and use tax exemption for sales and uses related to eligible server equipment and power infrastructures installed in eligible computer data centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2014-03-04 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2769 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-05 - First reading, referred to Finance