WA SB6619 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Including approved private schools in the superintendent of public instruction's record check information rules.
Title
Including approved private schools in the superintendent of public instruction's record check information rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-11 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | EDU - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-04 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-01 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-19 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2996 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-17 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6619&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6619.pdf |