WA SB6638 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an assessment on cattle.
Title
Concerning an assessment on cattle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | AWRD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development. |