WA SB6651 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Preventing the local prohibition of tenant evictions for any period of time.
Title
Preventing the local prohibition of tenant evictions for any period of time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | FIET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 9:30 AM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |