WA SJM8003 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting Congress to amend the Communications Decency Act.
Title
Requesting Congress to amend the Communications Decency Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2014-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | TED - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-26 | House | TED - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |