WA SJM8008 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Urging federal legislation to prohibit the sale of tobacco and vapor products to anyone under the age of twenty-one.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging federal legislation to prohibit the sale of tobacco and vapor products to anyone under the age of twenty-one.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-27HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-27HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-27HouseHCW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2019-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-25SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-19SenateMade eligible to be placed on second reading.
2019-02-07SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-06SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-04SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-28SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback