WA SJM8014 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning logging and mining in the upper Skagit watershed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning logging and mining in the upper Skagit watershed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReturned to Senate Rules 3.
2020-03-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2020-03-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-28HouseRDAN - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources.
2020-01-15SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-01-15SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-01-13SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-24SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-23SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-23SenateAWNP - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-23SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 8:30 AM.
2019-04-22SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback